Gonzalez, Fernando (CPSO#: 78807)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Mar 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2003 to 15 Apr 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 16 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 14 Mar 2004
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Mar 2004