Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Gonzalez, Hernan (CPSO#: 26715)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Chile, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Feb 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Oct 1989