Gonzalez, Pedro Antonio (CPSO#: 94708)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 25 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2011 to 13 Apr 2011
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Apr 2011