Goobie, Paul William Arnold (CPSO#: 62377)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Nov 2000