Good, David James (CPSO#: 79628)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens University
Dept of Pathology and Molecular Med
Richardson Laboratory Room 201c
88 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2823
Fax: (613) 533-2907
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David J. Good Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Good ( CPSO# 79628 )

Business Address:
Queens University
Department of Pathology and Molecular Medicine
Richardson Lab - Room 201c
88 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2823

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JAMES GOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2008