Good, Hilton Scott (CPSO#: 66792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43581
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. S. Good Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Good ( CPSO# 66792 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 1G4
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Business Address:
Suite 115
121 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Phone Number: (705) 726-4531

Business Address:
112 St Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 1N6

Business Address:
25 Jeffery Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1K6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Georgian Bay General Hospital,Penetanguishene Site Penetanguishene
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HILTON SCOTT GOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOOD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998