Goodale, Natalie Nanette (CPSO#: 76244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: Roy, Natalie Nanette (used until: 28 May 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
City of Lakes Family Health Team
Pioneer Manor Site
Unit C
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone: (705) 560-1018
Fax: (705) 566-7617
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Goodale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Goodale ( CPSO# 76244 )

Business Address:
City of Lakes Family Health Team
Pioneer Manor Site
Unit C
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone Number: (705) 560-1018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE NANETTE GOODALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003