Goodall, John Christopher (CPSO#: 24160)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Health SC (Ottawa)
101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: 613-945-1551
Fax: 613-945-1555
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN CHRISTOPHER GOODALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODALL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1992