Goodall, Robert James (CPSO#: 28631)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Belleville and Quinte West Community Health Centre 161 Bride St W Belleville, ON K8P 1K2
Date Received: 25 May 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Mar 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017