Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Goode, John Eric (CPSO#: 30451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone: (705) 444-1646
Fax: (705) 444-1909
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Eric Goode Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Goode ( CPSO# 30451 )

Business Address:
201 - 1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone Number: (705) 444-1648

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ERIC GOODE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1978