Goode, Laura Colleen (CPSO#: 86771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
216E-2115 Finch Ave. W.
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone: 416-740-1832
Fax: 416-747-3799
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Goode Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Goode ( CPSO# 86771 )

Business Address:
Suite 216E
2115 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 740-1832

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 20 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA COLLEEN GOODE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012