Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Goodge, John Douglas (CPSO#: 27518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
304 Bellevue Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 5E1
Phone: (705) 743-8029
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Goodge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Goodge ( CPSO# 27518 )

Business Address:
304 Bellevue Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 5G1
Phone Number: (705) 743-8029

Medical Records Location

Address: Brookdale Family Clinic 304 Bellevue Street Peterborough ON K9H 5G1 Tel: 705-743-8029
Date Received: 21 Nov 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS GOODGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODGE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1975