Goodman, Daniel Noah Frederick (CPSO#: 60899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2025 Midland Avenue
Suite 200
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone: (416) 296-1911
Fax: (416) 296-1910
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oxford Medical Imaging
300 Harwood Avenue S.
Ajax ON  L1S 2J1
Canada
Phone: 905-426-8976
Fax: 905-426-7843
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Oxford Medical Imaging
10 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
Mississauga ON  L5R 3K6
Canada
Phone: 905-568-3768
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Goodman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Goodman ( CPSO# 60899 )

Business Address:
CML Healthcare
MRI/CT Imaging Centre
Unit 3
300 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J1
Phone Number: (905) 426-8976

Business Address:
Suite 200
2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2

Business Address:
10 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
Mississauga ON  L5R 3K6
Phone Number: (905) 568-3768

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL NOAH FREDERICK GOODMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990