Goodman, Robert Leslie (CPSO#: 60228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus Room B6-118
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Goodman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goodman ( CPSO# 60228 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Surgery, Division of Cardiac Surgery
University Campus Room B6-118
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT LESLIE GOODMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Nov 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1995