Goodman, Rusty Calvin Jay (CPSO#: 54056)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1985


Former Name: Goodman, Calvin Jay (used until: 11 Feb 2014 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham-Stouffville Health Centre
377 Church Street
Suite 403
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-7147
Fax: (905) 472-6943
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham


Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 05 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. RUSTY CALVIN JAY GOODMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1985