Goodman, Saul Hart (CPSO#: 65031)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 17 May 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 15 Feb 1998 to 31 May 1998
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Sep 2001