Goodman, Stuart Barry (CPSO#: 50760)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2006