Goodmurphy, Matthew John (CPSO#: 103324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1K8
Phone: 807-737-1802
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1001 Queen St W
Toronto
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Canada
Phone: 4165358501
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Goodmurphy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Goodmurphy ( CPSO# 103324)

Business Address:
4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1K8
Phone Number: (807) 737-1802

Business Address:
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JOHN GOODMURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODMURPHY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016