Goodwin, Beverly Joan (CPSO#: 58583)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: Wilson, Beverly Joan (used until: 26 Mar 1991 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o Lanark County Mental Health
Unit A2
88 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 5K9
Phone: (613) 283-2170
Fax: (613) 283-9018
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Aug 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEVERLY JOAN GOODWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODWIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1997 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1998 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1988