Goodwin, Graine Marian (CPSO#: 60458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
315 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M4V 2H2
Phone: (416) 921-1094
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Goodwin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Goodwin ( CPSO# 60458 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
315 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M4V 2H2
Phone Number: (416) 921-1094

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAINE MARIAN GOODWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODWIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Oct 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1990