Goodwin, Kelly Meg (CPSO#: 92774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rideau Crossing Family Health
Center
90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-0100
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly Goodwin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Goodwin ( CPSO# 92774 )

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Business Address:
Rideau Crossing Family Health Centre
90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-0100

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7700

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY MEG GOODWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODWIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2015