Goodwin, Kenneth Mackay (CPSO#: 14644)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 27 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1954
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Nov 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995