Goodwin, Pamela Jean (CPSO#: 33014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 1284
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8605
Fax: (416) 586-8659
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pamela J. Goodwin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Goodwin ( CPSO# 33014 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 1284
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8605

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA JEAN GOODWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODWIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1981