Goodyear, Marilyn Dawn (CPSO#: 84019)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 06 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 09 Jan 2006 to 03 Feb 2006
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2007 to 29 Jul 2007
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2007