Goodyear, Michael David Edwin (CPSO#: 50764)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Monash University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2004