Goonetillake, Piyanthi (CPSO#: 82075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:University of Ruhuna, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 120
330 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Phone: (905) 693-1314
Fax: (905) 693-8892
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Piyanthi Goonetillake Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Goonetillake ( CPSO# 82075 )

Business Address:
Suite 120
330 Bronte Street
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Phone Number: (905) 693-1314

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Sri Lanka

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jan 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIYANTHI GOONETILLAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOONETILLAKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Jan 2005 to 25 Apr 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2007