Goossen, Christine Marie (CPSO#: 61931)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Anaesthesia Associates
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone: (519) 744-7361
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: (519) 749-4216
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-6578
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. M. Goossen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Goossen ( CPSO# 61931 )

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6485

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARIE GOOSSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOOSSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1990