Goossen, Randolph Bernhard (CPSO#: 53444)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2006