Gopal, Deepak (CPSO#: 66451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Wisconsin Hospitals
Div. of Gastroenterology
Suite 4000,UWMF Centennial Building
1685 Highland Avenue
Madison WI  53705-2281
United States
Phone: (608) 263-7322
Fax: (608) 265-5677

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Wisconsin

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEEPAK GOPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOPAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1997