Gopinath, Raghunandan (CPSO#: 54081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 463-6053
Fax: (416) 463-6052
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gopinath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gopinath ( CPSO# 54081 )

Business Address:
211 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 463-6053

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAGHUNANDAN GOPINATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOPINATH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1985