Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Gopinath, Ramya (CPSO#: 61868)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Marathi, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2003