Gopinathan, Hema (CPSO#: 23982)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Tamil

Education:University of Delhi, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 1990