Goplen, Gary Bernard (CPSO#: 63425)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 17 Nov 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Nov 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 04 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Aug 1993
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 17 Nov 1994