Gordon, David George (CPSO#: 33361)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 03 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005