Gordon, Elaine Paula (CPSO#: 53460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 1985


Former Name: Gordon, Ellaine Paula (used until: 13 May 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Health Sciences Centre
Room 3U6 (3U 1-9)
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76645
Fax: (905) 521-5053
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elaine Gordon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2006

Dr. E. Gordon ( CPSO# 53460 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Health Sciences Centre
Room 3U6
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 527-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton


Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ELAINE PAULA GORDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORDON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1985