Gordon, Gabriel Robert (CPSO#: 59979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
89 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 545-1166
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABRIEL ROBERT GORDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORDON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1989