Gordon, Janet Eileen (CPSO#: 71978)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Mar 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Mar 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Oct 1997 to 07 Nov 1997
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 Jan 1998 to 28 Feb 1998
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 28 Feb 1998 to 27 Mar 1998
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 1998