Gordon, Mary Elaine (CPSO#: 27935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Oct 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Pipe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pipe ( CPSO# 27583 )
Dr. M. Gordon ( CPSO# 27935 )

Business Address:
Prevention & Rehabilitation Centre
University of Ottawa, Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4756

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY ELAINE GORDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORDON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1975