Gordon, Michelle Marie (CPSO#: 71688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17 Dunedin Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5T3
Phone: (705) 327-9143
Fax: (705) 327-9189
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Parry Sound Health Centre
10 James Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 1T2
Canada
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle Gordon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gordon ( CPSO# 71688 )

Business Address:
17 Dunedin Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5T3
Phone Number: (705) 327-9143

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE MARIE GORDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 28 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2001