Gordon, Sherif Albert Abd El Sayed (CPSO#: 90358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glen Derry Professional
Walk-In Clinic
2760 Derry Road West
Mississauga ON  L5N 3N5
Phone: (289) 997-3220
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gordon ( CPSO# 90358 )

Business Address:
Glen Derry Professional Walk-In Clinic
2760 Derry Road West
Suite 3
Mississauga ON  L5N 3N5
Phone Number: (289) 997-3220

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERIF ALBERT ABD EL SAYED GORDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORDON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2011