Gore, Stanley Larry (CPSO#: 26503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Mar 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Silver Birch Avenue
Toronto ON  M4E 3K9
Phone: (416) 690-2160
Fax: (416) 698-0337
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 07 Mar 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 07 Mar 2011 Active View Details [+]

            As from March 7, 2011, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Stanley Larry Gore,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Gore to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario(the "College"):

                  Dr. Gore shall not perform or teach any cosmetic surgical procedure which
                  falls within the definition of "procedure" in s. 44(1) of O.Reg. 114/94,
                  to the Medicine Act, 1991, as may be amended from time to time. 
                  
            On March 7, 2011, Dr. Stanley Larry Gore entered into an undertaking with the
            College in which Dr. Gore consents to certain terms being deemed to be a term,
            condition and limitation on his certificate of registration (see above for the
            term, condition and limitation) and consents to entry in the public register of
            the entire undertaking, as follows: 

            UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND CONSENT

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Gore, certificate of registration number 26503, am a member of the
            College.  
                  As of January 2009, I voluntarily and permanently ceased performing
                  cosmetic surgical procedures because of cumulative orthopedic problems.
                  I acknowledge that cessation of my surgical practice occurred during the
                  course of an investigation into my cosmetic surgery practice under s. 75
                  of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Sch. 2 to the Regulated Heath
                  Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18.
                  
            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (2)   I, Dr. Gore, understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.

            (3)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gore, undertake that, I will not resume performing or
                        teaching any cosmetic   surgical procedure which falls within the
                        definition of "procedure" in s. 44(1) of     O/Reg. 114/94 to the
                        Medicine Act, 1991, as may be amended from time to time.
                  
            (4)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gore, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my office(s),
                        practice(s) and patient charts by a College representative for the
                        purposes of monitoring my compliance with the terms of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  
                  
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (5)   I, Dr. Gore, undertake to comply with the terms and conditions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any term of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College (the "Discipline Committee").

            (6)   I, Dr. Gore, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have
                  obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            D.    CONSENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Gore, consent to certain terms of this Undertaking being deemed to
                  be specified terms, conditions and limitations imposed on my certificate
                  of registration for the purpose of section 23 of the Health Professions
                  Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions
                  Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended.  Specifically, the following
                  shall be subject to this provision:  

                        Dr. Gore shall not perform or teach any cosmetic surgical procedure
                        which falls within the definition of "procedure" in s. 44(1) of
                        O.Reg. 114/94, to the Medicine Act, 1991, as may be amended from
                        time to time. 
                  
                  I understand that such specified terms, conditions and limitations, in
                  addition to the entirety of this undertaking, shall be information on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this restriction remains in effect.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jan 2005
Summary:

 On January 19, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Gore to have committed acts of professional 
 misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as being disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional in that he 
 signed or co-signed prescriptions for individuals who are not his patient and prescibed to both 
 people and animals without ever having seen or assessed the patient.  Additionally, he received 
 fees for each prescription co-signed, without advising the consumers of the fee, and to have 
 failed to keep charts or records for the patients.

The penalty hearing took place on March 10, 
 2005.  On March 10, 2005, the Discipline Committee accepted the joint submission on penalty 
 proposed by counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. Gore and ordered that Dr. Gore appear 
 before the panel to be reprimanded and that he pay $5,000 in costs to the College.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 10 Mar 2005
Hearing Date(s): Oct 04, 2004