Gorecki, John Paul (CPSO#: 52838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Neurosurgery Answer,
1100 Northside Forsyth
Suite 310
Cumming GA  30041
United States
Phone: 6787307796
Fax: 6787307786

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia
USA - Kansas
USA - North Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 04 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL GORECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORECKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Research Fellows - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1984