Gorenstein, Lyall Arnold (CPSO#: 52704)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5A Medical Park Drive
Pomona NY  10970
United States
Phone: (845) 362-0075

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009