Gorfinkel, John Arthur (CPSO#: 59075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 924-2766
Fax: (416) 924-0329
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Gorfinkel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gorfinkel ( CPSO# 59075 )

Business Address:
Suite 310
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 924-2766

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ARTHUR GORFINKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORFINKEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1992