Gorman, Howard Edwin (CPSO#: 30500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
315 Avenue Road
Suite 9
Toronto ON  M4V 2H2
Phone: (416) 964-6932
Fax: (416) 964-6932
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Howard E. Gorman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Gorman ( CPSO# 30500 )

Business Address:
9 - 315 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M4V 2H2
Phone Number: (416) 964-6932

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD EDWIN GORMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1978