Gorman, James Alexander (CPSO#: 58334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Medical Clinic
200 Bullock Drive
Markham ON  L3P 1W2
Phone: (905) 294-7111
Fax: (905) 294-0750
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 2M7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ALEXANDER GORMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1988