Gorman, Richard Fredrick (CPSO#: 26449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Sep 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
554 Spadina Crescent
Toronto ON  M5S 2J9
Phone: (416) 964-8713
Fax: (416) 964-6351
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gorman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gorman ( CPSO# 26449 )

Business Address:
2 - 554 Spadina Crescent
Toronto ON  M5S 2J9
Phone Number: (416) 964-8713

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2007
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 09 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 28 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Note:  To date, the steps below have not been taken by Dr. Gorman and, as such,
            he may not practice psychoanalysis. 

            The following  terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate
            of registration held by Dr. Richard Fredrick Gorman in accordance with an order
            made by the Discipline  Committee  of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
            Ontario and subsequent directions by  the  Discipline Committee made on June 8,
            2011, June 28, 2013, and June 5, 2014, to vary the order:

                  
            (i)   Dr. Gorman shall comply with the College  Policy  on Re-entering Practice
                  (Policy Statement #2-08) with respect to his engagement in psychoanalysis
                  and will abide by the College's plan for re-entry,  attached  as Schedule
                  "A" [to the Order], which incorporates the following components:

                  a.    under the supervision of a supervisor, who is to be approved by the
                        College,  Dr.  Gorman  shall  treat  two  (2)  female  patients for
                        psychoanalysis;
                  
                  b.    the supervisor shall report to the College after the first month of
                        Dr.  Gorman seeing a patient for psychoanalysis and then  quarterly
                        thereafter  for  the  duration  of  the  supervisory  relationship.
                        Supervision  will take place, initially, for one year, after  which
                        time  the College,  in  consultation  with  the  supervisor,  shall
                        determine whether additional supervision is required; 
                  
                  c.    12 months  after  commencing  treatment of the first psychoanalytic
                        patient, Dr. Gorman shall undergo an assessment of his practice and
                        abide  by  any  recommendations  made  by  the  assessor.   If  any
                        recommendations made by the assessor  constitute  terms, conditions
                        or  limitations  on Dr. Gorman's certificate of registration,  such
                        terms, conditions  or  limitations  will be imposed on Dr. Gorman's
                        certificate of registration and appear on the public register; and

            (ii)  Dr.  Gorman shall pay all of the costs of the  clinical  supervision  and
                  practice  assessment associated with this re-entry to practice program in
                  relation to his engagement in a psychoanalysis practice.




Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Mar 2007
Summary:

On March 26, 2007, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Gorman to have committed acts of 
professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, and that he engaged in sexual abuse of a patient. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered the following: 
 
      1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Gorman's certificate of registration for twenty-four (24) 
            months to begin two (2) weeks from the date of this order.  Twelve (12) months 
            of this suspension is to be suspended if Dr. Gorman successfully completes an 
            ethics course acceptable to the College and continues in psychotherapy with a 
            therapist acceptable to the College for as long as the therapist deems necessary, 
            but not to be less than two years. 
 
      2.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
            Gorman's certificate of registration: 
 
      i)    Dr. Gorman is restricted from doing psychoanalysis. 
 
      ii)   Dr. Gorman's practice in psychotherapy and psychodynamics, with regard to 
            female patients, be supervised at Dr. Gorman's expense by a supervisor acceptable 
            to the College and who has read the decision of the Discipline Committee. The 
            supervisor will sign an undertaking acceptable to the College to meet with Dr. 
            Gorman and review the cases of all female patients every two (2) weeks.  After 
            two (2) years, the frequency of the meetings may be reduced to once (1) per month 
            if deemed acceptable by the College following the report of the supervisor.  The 
            supervisor will report in writing to the College every six (6) months on the state of 
            Dr. Gorman's practice as regards female patients. 
 
      iii)  Dr. Gorman continue in psychotherapy with a therapist acceptable to the College 
            for not less than two (2) years and thereafter as long as the therapist deems 
            necessary. The therapist, who has read the decision of the Discipline Committee, 
            will sign an undertaking acceptable to the College to act as Dr. Gorman's 
            therapist. 
 
      3.    Dr. Gorman attend before the Committee to be reprimanded on a date to be fixed 
            by the panel or no later than three ( 3) months from the date this order becomes 
            final. 
 
      4.    Dr. Gorman pay a fine of $15,000 to the Treasurer of Ontario within one (1) 
            month of the date this order becomes final. 
 
      5.    Any future request for a variation from this order is to be brought before the 
            Discipline Committee. 
 
      6.    The parties may deliver written submissions with respect to costs within twenty 
            one (21) days from the date of this decision. 
 
On June 8, 2011, the Discipline Committee, further to a motion by Dr. Gorman, directed that 
effective immediately paragraph 2 (ii) of the Order of the Discipline Committee dated March 26, 
2007, be varied: 
 
      1.    to exclude Dr. Gorman's hospital practice from the scope of supervision; and 
       
      2.    to reduce the frequency of private practice supervision, as specified in paragraph 2 
            (ii) of the 2007 Order, to four times a year (quarterly) rather than monthly. 
 
On June 28, 2013, the Discipline Committee, further to a motion by Dr. Gorman, ordered and 
directed that effective immediately, paragraph 2(ii) of the Order of the Discipline Committee of 
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario dated March 26, 2007, as varied by the further 
Order of the Discipline Committee dated June 8, 2011, be varied to eliminate the supervision 
requirement contained therein. 
 
On June 5, 2014, the Discipline Committee, further to a motion by Dr. Gorman, ordered and 
directed that the Registrar remove the term, condition and limitation on Dr. Gorman's certificate 
of registration that he be restricted from doing psychoanalysis. 
 
The Discipline Committee also directed that the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions 
and limitations on Dr. Gorman's certificate of registration: 
 
(i)   Dr. Gorman shall comply with the College Policy on Re-entering Practice (Policy 
      Statement #2-08) with respect to his engagement in psychoanalysis and will abide by the 
      College's plan for re-entry, attached as Schedule "A" to this Order, which incorporates the 
      following components: 
 
      a.    Under the supervision of a supervisor, who is to be approved by the College, Dr. 
            Gorman shall treat two (2) female patients for psychoanalysis; 
 
      b.    the supervisor shall report to the College after the first month of Dr. Gorman 
            seeing a patient for psychoanalysis and then quarterly thereafter for the duration of 
            the supervisory relationship.   Supervision will take place, initially, for one year, 
            after which time the College, in consultation with the supervisor, shall determine 
            whether additional supervision is required;  
 
      c.    12 months after commencing treatment of the first psychoanalytic patient, Dr. 
            Gorman shall undergo an assessment of his practice and abide by any 
            recommendations made by the assessor.  If any recommendations made by the 
            assessor constitute terms, conditions or limitations on Dr. Gorman's certificate of 
            registration, such terms, conditions or limitations will be imposed on Dr. 
            Gorman's certificate of registration and appear on the public register; and 
  
(ii)  Dr. Gorman shall pay all of the costs of the clinical supervision and practice assessment 
      associated with this re-entry to practice program in relation to his engagement in a 
      psychoanalysis practice. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 11, 2006