Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Gormandy, Winston Derek Andre (CPSO#: 30963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2077 Lakeshore Blvd. West
Etobicoke ON  M8V 4C2
Phone: 416-901-4751
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Winston Gormandy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Gormandy ( CPSO# 30963 )

Business Address:
2077 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8V 4C2
Phone Number: (416) 901-4751

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Trinidad and Tobago

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WINSTON DEREK ANDRE GORMANDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORMANDY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1979