Gorodetsky, Olga Leonidovna (CPSO#: 75868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Minsk State Medical Institute, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-3103
Fax: (905) 853-2533
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gorodetsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Gorodetsky ( CPSO# 75868 )

Business Address:
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 853-3103

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLGA LEONIDOVNA GORODETSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORODETSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
International Specialist Physician - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2003