Goronfolah, Loie Tallat Abdullah (CPSO#: 82087)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2005 to 17 Feb 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 18 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009